NH HB1312 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0180; Effective date 7/11/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0180; Effective date 7/11/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study offshore wind energy and the development of other ocean power technology.
Title
Establishing a committee to study offshore wind energy and the development of other ocean power technology.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. William Baber [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Robert Backus [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Grossman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0180; Effective date 7/11/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/8/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2014-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0380h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #0380h (NT) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0380h (New Title) |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0380h for Feb 19 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 11:00 Amendment 304 Legislative Office Building |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy |