NH HB1287 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the age at which persons may marry.
Title
Relative to the age at which persons may marry.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Stone [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 59 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-06 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Stone) 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 5 |