NH HB1258 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Notice of Reconsideration (Rep. Yokela) for 02/13/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the impact on youth of media concerning them available on the Internet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the impact on youth of media concerning them available on the Internet.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - ITL (Y: 174 N: 153 NV: 17 Abs: 52) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseNotice of Reconsideration (Rep. Yokela) for 02/13/2020
2020-02-13HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-153 02/13/2020
2020-01-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2020-01-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/13/2020 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 5
2020-01-14HouseExecutive Session: 01/21/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2020-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback