NH HB1239 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eligibility for the Supplemental Nutritional Assistance Program.
Title
Relative to eligibility for the Supplemental Nutritional Assistance Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 15 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 10 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 14 |