NH HB1231 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to failure to make payment of compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to failure to make payment of compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2022-01-27House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/27/2022 09:30 am State HouseReps Hall
2022-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 01/20/2022 2:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307
2021-11-18HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback