NH HB1226 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-25 - Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 3:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303
Pending: House Environment and Agriculture Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 3:00 pm in Legislative Office Building 301-303
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 3:00 pm in Legislative Office Building301-303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the declawing of cats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the declawing of cats.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2022 3:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303
2022-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
2021-11-18HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Environment and Agriculture

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback