NH HB120 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB120
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Children and Family Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Children and Family Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the closure of the Sununu Youth Services Center and operation of a replacement secure facility.
Title
Relative to the closure of the Sununu Youth Services Center and operation of a replacement secure facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law |
Same As/Similar To
HB120 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Retained in Committee