NH HB120 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 182; I. Sec. 12 Eff: 01/01/2023 II. Rem. Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 182; I. Sec. 12 Eff: 01/01/2023 II. Rem. Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to administration of psychotropic medications to children in foster care.
Title
Relative to administration of psychotropic medications to children in foster care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 182; I. Sec. 12 Eff: 01/01/2023 II. Rem. Eff: 01/01/2022 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2064eba: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021 House Journal 11 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2064e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1179h (Rep. Rice): Motion Adopted DV 204-154 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 1 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1179s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1179s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1179s, 04/29/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/14/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0517h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 2 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0517h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 2 |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0517h (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 3 |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927749754 |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94672611666 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 36 |