NH HB1189 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting voluntary donations to municipalities or the state to fund certain projects or to reduce taxation.
Title
Permitting voluntary donations to municipalities or the state to fund certain projects or to reduce taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/26/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Ways and Means |