NH HB1187 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting lease agreements of equipment for building or facility improvements.
Title
Relative to prohibiting lease agreements of equipment for building or facility improvements.
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Pauer [R] | Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Rep. Richard Brown [R] |
Rep. John Lewicke [R] | Rep. Keith Erf [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-31 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2155s (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 22 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2155s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2024-2155s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved Ought to Pass; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024 Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar on 05/22/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 1187 from the Consent Calendar; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1229h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 92 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1229h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 92 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1229h (NT) 03/20/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2024-03-11 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-03-06 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/11/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government |