NH HB1182 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the office of professional licensure and certification for technology upgrades for the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Title
Making an appropriation to the office of professional licensure and certification for technology upgrades for the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Potucek [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
Rep. Joseph Hannon [R] | Rep. Barbara Biggie [R] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/23/2016 04:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Forrester, Hosmer; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Biggie, Abel, Kurk 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 3 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1938s and Requests CofC (Reps. Hunt, Major): Motion Adopted DV 217-82 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 3 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1938s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2016-1938s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/12/2016; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1417s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1417s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016 Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment #2016-1417s, New Title, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment, 04/21/2016 Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1417s, New Title, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Introduced 03/24/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 7 |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2016 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 19 P. 5 |
2016-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 3 |
2016-02-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0260h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 2 |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment #2016-0260h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 2 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0260h (NT) for 02/10/2016 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 2 |
2016-01-19 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building302 |
2016-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-01-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/28/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 5 |