NH HB1174 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring screening for all law enforcement officers for psychological stability prior to assuming their duties as certified officers.
Title
Requiring screening for all law enforcement officers for psychological stability prior to assuming their duties as certified officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Rep. Linda Harriott-Gathright [D] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] |
Rep. David Meuse [D] | Rep. Sandy Swinburne [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0940h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 146 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0940h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 146 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0940h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 41 |
2020-02-26 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/03/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 (if necessary) |
2020-02-19 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-30 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-09 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 12 |