NH HB1173 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming August 9 as Indigenous People's Day.
Title
Proclaiming August 9 as Indigenous People's Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 11:50 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 2:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |