NH HB1163 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 115; eff. 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 115; eff. 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to review of public school minimum standards by the legislative oversight committee.
Title
Relative to review of public school minimum standards by the legislative oversight committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 115; eff. 09/01/2024 |
2024-06-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2197e (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2197e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/30/2024); Senate Journal 17 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 6 |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/08/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 6 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/08/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education |