NH HB115 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-169 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-169 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state minimum wage and providing for adjustments to the minimum wage.
Title
Establishing a state minimum wage and providing for adjustments to the minimum wage.
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas Ley [D] | Rep. William Pearson [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Howard Moffett [D] |
Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 193 N: 169 NV: 11 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-169 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 35 |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 17 |