NH HB1145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-15 - Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-15 - Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the private ownership of landfills.
Title
Prohibiting the private ownership of landfills.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Rep. Nicholas Germana [D] | Rep. David Rochefort [R] | Rep. Kelley Potenza [R] |
Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 208 N: 162 NV: 12 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Table (Y: 180 N: 193 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2024-03-28 - House - Table (Y: 180 N: 193 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1329h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-162 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 148 |
2024-03-28 | House | FLAM # 2024-1329h (Reps. Germana, Simon): Amendment Adopted DV 234-125 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 148 |
2024-03-28 | House | Lay HB1145 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 180-193 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 146 |
2024-03-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-03-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/19/2024 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 29 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-14 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |