NH HB1142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0268; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0268; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the road toll for alternative fuels.
Title
Relative to the road toll for alternative fuels.
Sponsors
Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. John Graham [R] |
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 258 N: 58 NV: 40 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - (Y: 274 N: 41 NV: 40 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - (Y: 274 N: 41 NV: 40 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0268; Effective Date 1/1/2015. |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1900eba Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment 1900e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/14, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-03-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1168h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 258-58 |
2014-03-26 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1168h (Rep. Graham) Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 274-41 |
2014-03-26 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Failed Div 102-207 |
2014-03-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 25 |
2014-03-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for Mar 25 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Time Change) |
2014-02-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/10/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0402h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #0402h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0402h for Feb 12 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 9 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public Works and Highways |