NH HB1138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-114 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-114 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the display of a front license plate on certain vehicles.
Title
Exempting the display of a front license plate on certain vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Jason Osborne [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. David Binford [R] |
Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 226 N: 114 NV: 50 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-114 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Transportation |