NH HB1129 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2020; Chapter 8; I. Sec. 1 Eff: 09/08/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/10/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2020; Chapter 8; I. Sec. 1 Eff: 09/08/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/10/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notice requirements for certain municipal public hearings, providing for optional town meeting procedures during the state of emergency declared in response to the novel coronavirus disease (Covid-19), and relative to online reporting of CARES Act disbursements.
Title
Relative to notice requirements for certain municipal public hearings, providing for optional town meeting procedures during the state of emergency declared in response to the novel coronavirus disease (Covid-19), and relative to online reporting of CARES Act disbursements.
Sponsors
Rep. David Coursin [D] | Rep. Arthur Barnes [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Julie Gilman [D] |
Rep. Sherry Dutzy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2020; Chapter 8; I. Sec. 1 Eff: 09/08/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/10/2020 |
2020-07-06 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 70 |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Carson): Motion Adopted DV 252-69 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 57 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2020-1480s, and 2020-1524s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Sen. Morgan Floor Amendment # 2020-1524s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1480s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1480s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 939 4171 9223 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,93941719223# or 19292056099,,93941719223# Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_UHPWI_mSR4q7lP_4RClwXA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 01:40 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1352s; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 01:35 pm; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0696h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 55 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0696h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 55 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0696h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 25 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 10 |