NH HB1128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-187 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-187 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of a scholarship organization for purposes of the education tax credit.
Title
Relative to the definition of a scholarship organization for purposes of the education tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 191 N: 187 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 185 N: 188 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 185 N: 188 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-187 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 70 |
2024-02-22 | House | Lay HB1128 on Table (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Failed DV 189-189 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 70 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 185-188 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 68 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 01/24/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2024 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education |