NH HB111 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to land retained by the state.
Title
Relative to land retained by the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 566 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 351 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 1/27/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Full Committee Work Session: 1/27/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 7, PG. 117 |