NH HB1108 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 239-102 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 239-102 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the prescribed manner of posting land.
Title
Relative to the prescribed manner of posting land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 239 N: 102 NV: 18 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 239-102 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |