NH HB1100 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Lay HB1100 on Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Adopted DV 240-123 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Lay HB1100 on Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Adopted DV 240-123 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to coyote hunting.
Title
Relative to coyote hunting.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Diane Kelley [R] | Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] |
Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Lay HB1100 on Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Adopted DV 240-123 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2024-02-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-02-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/06/2024 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 20 |
2024-01-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources |