NH HB106 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-172 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-172 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to extreme risk protection orders.
Title
Relative to extreme risk protection orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 198 N: 172 NV: 7 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 198 N: 172 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 198 N: 172 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-172 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 22 |
2023-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB106-FN 02/16/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 11 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 01:00 pm State House Reps Hall |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |