NH HB1053 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Lay HB1053 on Table (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Adopted DV 316-18 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Lay HB1053 on Table (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Adopted DV 316-18 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to permissible residential units in a commercial zone.
Title
Relative to permissible residential units in a commercial zone.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Lay HB1053 on Table (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Adopted DV 316-18 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 112 |
2024-03-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-03-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/11/2024 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government |