NH HB1051 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting certain deductions from wages of restaurant employees.
Title
Relative to prohibiting certain deductions from wages of restaurant employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 11 |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |