NH HB1037 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 56; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 56; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the governor's duties during a state of emergency.
Title
Relative to the governor's duties during a state of emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 56; Eff. 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0071h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2022-0071h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0071h (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-13 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 2:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |