NH HB1003 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 52; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 52; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting health care providers from refusing to provide care or services based on patient vaccination status.
Title
Prohibiting health care providers from refusing to provide care or services based on patient vaccination status.
Sponsors
Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Niki Kelsey [R] | Rep. Melissa Blasek [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. Diane Pauer [R] | Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 52; Eff. 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Hearing: 03/23/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0702h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0702h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |