NH CACR6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0291h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0291h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the retirement age of judges. Providing that the retirement age of judges be increased.
Title
Relating to the retirement age of judges. Providing that the retirement age of judges be increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0291h |
2021-02-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 74 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94597513398 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 47 |