NH CACR3 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 228-133; House Journal 21, PG.470-473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 228-133; House Journal 21, PG.470-473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to parental rights. Providing that parents have the natural right to control the health, education, and welfare of their children.
Title
Relating to parental rights. Providing that parents have the natural right to control the health, education, and welfare of their children.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Timothy Comerford [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - ITL (Y: 228 N: 133 NV: 18 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 228-133; House Journal 21, PG.470-473 |
2013-02-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 15, PG.270 |
2013-02-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 20 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.270 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG.185 |