NE LR289CA | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Constitutional amendment to prohibit laws that restrict or interfere with choice of health care plans or direct payment for medical services
Title
Constitutional amendment to prohibit laws that restrict or interfere with choice of health care plans or direct payment for medical services
Sponsors
Sen. Beau McCoy [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2010 | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to Reference Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9640 |