NE LR157 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Rereferred to Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Rereferred to Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the January 1, 2017, implementation of the managed care delivery system for the State of Nebraska and the impact on the state budget
Title
Interim study to examine the January 1, 2017, implementation of the managed care delivery system for the State of Nebraska and the impact on the state budget
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Rereferred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33574 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR157.pdf |