NE LB954 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preempt certain county and municipality resolutions or ordinances relating to electronic smoking devices under the Nebraska Clean Indoor Air Act
Title
Preempt certain county and municipality resolutions or ordinances relating to electronic smoking devices under the Nebraska Clean Indoor Air Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2022 |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |