NE LB951 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB850 amended into LB951 by AM2061
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB850 amended into LB951 by AM2061
Summary
Change provisions relating to early voting, multiple officeholding, and provisional ballots
Title
Change provisions relating to early voting, multiple officeholding, and provisional ballots
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB850 amended into LB951 by AM2061 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB716 amended into LB951 by AM2061 | |
2010-04-06 | Approved by Governor on April 05, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Krist explanation of vote | |
2010-03-30 | Presented to Governor on March 30, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-03-30 | Passed on Final Reading 32-11-6 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Final Reading with ST9089 | |
2010-03-24 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-03-24 | Lautenbaugh FA66 withdrawn | |
2010-03-24 | Avery AM2061 adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Lautenbaugh FA66 filed | |
2010-03-02 | Avery AM2061 pending | |
2010-03-02 | Avery AM2061 filed | |
2010-03-02 | Enrollment and Review ER8171 adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Enrollment and Review ER8171 filed | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on Select File with ER8171 | |
2010-02-23 | Cook name added | |
2010-02-23 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on General File | |
2010-02-08 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill | |
2010-01-20 | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2010 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9971 |