NE LB946 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Cash Reserve Fund
Title
Change provisions relating to the Cash Reserve Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 40-5-4 (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 03, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 40-5-4 |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER127 adopted |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER127 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER127 |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO258 failed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO258 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO257 failed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO257 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO255 failed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO255 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO254 failed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO254 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers AM2368 withdrawn |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1701 adopted |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Chambers AM2368 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1701 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1701 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |