NE LB936 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Nebraska Political Accountability and Disclosure Act to authorize expenditures for conference expenses for certain members of an officeholder's family
Title
Change the Nebraska Political Accountability and Disclosure Act to authorize expenditures for conference expenses for certain members of an officeholder's family
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40690 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB936.pdf |