NE LB916 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Returned by Governor without approval on April 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Returned by Governor without approval on April 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate integrated practice agreements and provide for transition-to-practice agreements for nurse practitioners
Title
Eliminate integrated practice agreements and provide for transition-to-practice agreements for nurse practitioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on April 22, 2014 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Larson explanation of vote |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 17, 2014 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers AM2830 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Scheer AM2823 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Scheer AM2822 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Scheer AM2821 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Scheer AM2820 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Scheer AM2819 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Scheer AM2818 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Scheer AM2817 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Scheer AM2601 lost |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER214 adopted |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Chambers AM2830 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Scheer AM2823 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Scheer AM2822 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Scheer AM2821 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Scheer AM2820 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Scheer AM2819 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Scheer AM2818 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Scheer AM2817 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Scheer AM2601 filed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER214 filed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER214 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Scheer AM2568 withdrawn |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1916 adopted |
2014-03-21 | Legislature | Scheer AM2568 filed |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Watermeier priority bill |
2014-02-19 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1916 filed |
2014-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1916 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Cook name added |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Krist name added |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2014 |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Watermeier name added |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |