NE LB913 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB913 amended into LB750 by AM1966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB913 amended into LB750 by AM1966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions relating to construction of highways and roads
Title
Changes provisions relating to construction of highways and roads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB913 amended into LB750 by AM1966 |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |