NE LB908 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the disposition of indigent defense court fees
Title
Change the disposition of indigent defense court fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-04-04 | Lautenbaugh MO101 approved | |
2012-04-04 | Lautenbaugh MO101 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 12, 2012 filed | |
2012-04-04 | Judiciary AM2319 pending | |
2012-03-07 | Judiciary AM2319 filed | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on General File with AM2319 | |
2012-02-21 | Speaker priority bill | |
2012-01-11 | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2012 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15832 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB908.pdf |