NE LB895 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide restrictions on prior authorizations by managed care organizations under the Medical Assistance Act
Title
Provide restrictions on prior authorizations by managed care organizations under the Medical Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |