NE LB871 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Approved by Governor on March 14, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Approved by Governor on March 14, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for policies on financial eligibility and schedules of fees and copays under the Nebraska Behavioral Health Services Act
Title
Provide for policies on financial eligibility and schedules of fees and copays under the Nebraska Behavioral Health Services Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Approved by Governor on March 14, 2012 | |
2012-03-08 | Presented to Governor on March 08, 2012 | |
2012-03-08 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-03-08 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-02-24 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-02-24 | Enrollment and Review ER183 adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Enrollment and Review ER183 filed | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Select File with ER183 | |
2012-02-15 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on General File | |
2012-01-12 | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2012 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-01-06 | Date of introduction |