NE LB867 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB867 amended into LB1014 by AM2561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB867 amended into LB1014 by AM2561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Health and Human Services for Health Aid
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Health and Human Services for Health Aid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB867 amended into LB1014 by AM2561 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |