NE LB844 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Approved by Governor on March 18, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Approved by Governor on March 18, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Farm Labor Contractors Act
Title
Change provisions of the Farm Labor Contractors Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Ibach AM2891 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Jacobson FA252 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Legislature - Agriculture AM2449 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Ibach AM2891 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Jacobson FA252 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Legislature - Agriculture AM2449 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 18, 2024 |
2024-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Aguilar explanation of vote |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2024-03-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST47 recorded |
2024-03-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST47 filed |
2024-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST47 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Ibach AM2891 adopted |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Jacobson FA252 adopted |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Jacobson FA252 to AM2891 filed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Ibach AM2891 filed |
2024-02-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Erdman AM2208 withdrawn |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2449 adopted |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Agriculture priority bill |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2449 filed |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2449 |
2024-02-12 | Legislature | Hughes name added |
2024-02-02 | Legislature | Linehan name added |
2024-01-31 | Legislature | Erdman AM2208 filed |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Rereferred to Agriculture Committee |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Lippincott name added |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Holdcroft name added |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |