NE LB841 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB841 amended into LB843 by AM2075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB841 amended into LB843 by AM2075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for applications to register to vote and obtain ballots for Nebraska National Guard members and certain emergency response providers
Title
Provide for applications to register to vote and obtain ballots for Nebraska National Guard members and certain emergency response providers
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB841 amended into LB843 by AM2075 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |