NE LB757 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB757 amended into LB157 by AM1525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB757 amended into LB157 by AM1525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for applications under the Nebraska Crime Victim's Reparations Act
Title
Change requirements for applications under the Nebraska Crime Victim's Reparations Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB757 amended into LB157 by AM1525 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-26 | Legislature | Blood AM1506 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO832 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO829 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO833 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO831 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO828 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO830 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO827 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-21 | Legislature | Fredrickson AM903 filed |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |