NE LB742 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change county population thresholds
Title
Change county population thresholds
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 01, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST80 |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Hansen AM2649 adopted |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Hansen AM2649 filed |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2016 |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |