NE LB667 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for confidentiality of and access to certain injury reports under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Title
Provide for confidentiality of and access to certain injury reports under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |