NE LB613 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to hearings and decisions on appeals under the Tax Equalization and Review Commission Act
Title
Change provisions relating to hearings and decisions on appeals under the Tax Equalization and Review Commission Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-23 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |