NE LB414 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change county highway superintendent duties as prescribed and eliminate an annual report requirement
Title
Change county highway superintendent duties as prescribed and eliminate an annual report requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER119 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER119 filed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER119 |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |