NE LB357 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB357 amended into LB227 by AM1497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB357 amended into LB227 by AM1497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the maximum support allowable under the Disabled Persons and Family Support Act
Title
Change the maximum support allowable under the Disabled Persons and Family Support Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB357 amended into LB227 by AM1497 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-02-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2023 |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |